Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 45 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5602 Week
» 16747 Month
» 116532 Year
» 1781908 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #871
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1854   03/1918
O4 5378   22/07/1933
O4 6601   16/11/1935
O4 6366   27/08/1938
O4 3611   15/03/1948