Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 271 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1179 Week
» 12324 Month
» 112109 Year
» 1777485 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1025
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6573   04/11/1933
O4 5413   24/08/1935
O4 5381   11/03/1944
O4 5398   18/05/1946
O4 3734   20/08/1948