Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 344 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5063 Week
» 16208 Month
» 115993 Year
» 1781369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28340
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63610   25/08/1951
O4 63819   04/02/1954
O4 63721   20/10/1956
O4 63606   25/03/1961