Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 24 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 865 Week
» 14801 Month
» 142244 Year
» 1807620 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1947
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 385   12/11/1921
O4 6511   10/09/1929
O4 6360   25/07/1931
O4 5396   07/07/1934
O4 5383   15/08/1936
O4 5415   31/12/1938