Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 136 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4628 Week
» 29462 Month
» 63794 Year
» 1729170 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1265
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1902   03/1918
O4 6568   27/02/1932
O4 6534   09/06/1934
O4 6301   01/08/1936
O4 5383   17/12/1938