Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 25 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2951 Week
» 4689 Month
» 132132 Year
» 1797508 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3338
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5001   23/07/1938
O4 5387   12/10/1940
O4 6622   02/01/1943
O4 3885   11/05/1946
O4 3645   19/08/1948