Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 132 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4624 Week
» 29458 Month
» 63790 Year
» 1729166 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28355
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 63802   20/10/1951
O4 63613   05/02/1954
O1 63712   22/12/1956
O1 63676   21/09/1962