Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 646 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6177 Week
» 31011 Month
» 65343 Year
» 1730719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3245
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5389   13/06/1936
O4 6601   13/08/1938
O4 5011   15/03/1941
O4 6571   27/11/1943
O4 3769   05/04/1947