Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 220 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5751 Week
» 30585 Month
» 64917 Year
» 1730293 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1225
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1910   04/1918
O4 6265   20/09/1924
O4 6276   07/03/1931
O4 5392   20/05/1933
O4 6350   08/06/1935
O4 6633   11/1937
O4 6630   11/05/1940
O4 6608   04/04/1942