Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 607 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5078 Week
» 16124 Month
» 16124 Year
» 1681500 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1286
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2096   06/1919
O4 6618   23/07/1932
O4 6609   18/01/1935
O4 6612   27/02/1937
O4 5393   03/02/1940
O4 6372   02/01/1943