Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 268 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1176 Week
» 12321 Month
» 112106 Year
» 1777482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3309
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6512   23/10/1937
O4 6511   31/01/1942
O4 5005   10/06/1944
O4 3746   23/11/1946
O4 63618   26/03/1949