Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 655 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1563 Week
» 12708 Month
» 112493 Year
» 1777869 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28359
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63879   17/11/1951
O1 63869   14/11/1953
O1 63619   23/06/1956
O4 63915   22/11/1958
O4 63781   10/02/1962