Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 32 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 850 Week
» 17801 Month
» 170754 Year
» 1836130 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28316
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63676   12/05/1951
O1 63663   28/11/1953
O1 63725   25/02/1956
O1 63619   01/11/1958