Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 887 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5514 Week
» 7252 Month
» 134695 Year
» 1800071 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3236
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6334   28/03/1936
O4 6269   08/06/1938
O4 6313   21/12/1940
O4 5399   26/06/1943
O4 6275   19/05/1945
O4 3647   26/08/1947