Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 87 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1156 Week
» 1156 Month
» 68018 Year
» 1733394 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1115
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6574   20/08/1932
O4 6608   06/04/1935
O4 6607   26/06/1937
O4 6373   11/11/1939
O4 6575   28/02/1942
O4 6285   01/06/1944
O4 3735   11/01/1947
O4 63716   23/04/1949