Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 134 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4626 Week
» 29460 Month
» 63792 Year
» 1729168 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1756
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2005   01/1919
O4 6285   18/06/1926
O4 6339   07/06/1930
O4 6266   24/12/1932
O4 6639   07/04/1935