Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 239 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1080 Week
» 15016 Month
» 142459 Year
» 1807835 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3253
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6363   18/07/1936
O4 6326   19/11/1938
O4 6568   10/05/1941
O4 6367   29/01/1944
O4 5015   16/02/1946
O4 63718   05/06/1948