Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 279 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1120 Week
» 15056 Month
» 142499 Year
» 1807875 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1237
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6375   16/09/1933
O4 6526   11/05/1935
O4 6558   30/04/1938
O4 6376   03/05/1941
O4 6568   18/12/1943
O4 63908   17/12/1949