Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 338 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1179 Week
» 15115 Month
» 142558 Year
» 1807934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1287
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6340   08/06/1935
O4 6508   19/06/1937
O4 6603   29/07/1939
O4 6310   14/02/1942
O4 6261   22/07/1944
O4 3685   23/11/1946
O4 63742   18/06/1949