Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 644 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1552 Week
» 12697 Month
» 112482 Year
» 1777858 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3343
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6561   24/09/1938
O4 6510   04/01/1941
O4 6502   21/08/1943
O4 6284   23/02/1946
O4 3800   11/06/1948