Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 322 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1230 Week
» 12375 Month
» 112160 Year
» 1777536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1176
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6322   07/01/1933
O4 6618   03/11/1934
O4 6538   01/08/1936
O4 6523   17/09/1938
O4 6571   15/03/1941
O4 6582   24/12/1943