Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 236 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5767 Week
» 30601 Month
» 64933 Year
» 1730309 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1042
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1628   09/1918
O4 6278   14/07/1931
O4 6544   03/02/1934
O4 6298   03/10/1936
O4 6276   25/02/1939