Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 284 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1192 Week
» 12337 Month
» 112122 Year
» 1777498 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1090
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1701   12/1917
O4 6517   23/01/1932
O4 6326   18/08/1934
O4 6305   17/10/1936
O4 6548   04/11/1939
O4 6614   01/08/1942
O4 6577   08/01/1944