Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 336 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1405 Week
» 1405 Month
» 68267 Year
» 1733643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28365
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 63827   01/12/1951
O1 63755   12/02/1955
O4 63647   01/03/1958
O1 63874   02/08/1961