Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 329 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1237 Week
» 12382 Month
» 112167 Year
» 1777543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1169
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2147   06/1919
O4 6350   04/07/1931
O4 6637   30/09/1933
O4 6619   01/02/1936
O4 6520   25/09/1937