Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 63 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2989 Week
» 4727 Month
» 132170 Year
» 1797546 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28393
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63676   28/02/1953
O1 63792   30/06/1955
O4 63730   15/03/1958
O4 63818   09/06/1962