Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 327 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1396 Week
» 1396 Month
» 68258 Year
» 1733634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3258
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6307   29/08/1936
O4 6591   05/11/1938
O4 6347   15/03/1941
O4 6588   29/06/1942
O4 6538   04/08/1945
O4 3709   03/01/1948