Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 64 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2990 Week
» 4728 Month
» 132171 Year
» 1797547 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1249
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1921   05/1918
O4 6557   16/07/1932
O4 6260   22/12/1934
O4 6286   05/05/1939
O4 6345   13/09/1941