Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 339 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5058 Week
» 16203 Month
» 115988 Year
» 1781364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3291
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6344   08/05/1937
O4 6634   14/10/1939
O4 6344   21/03/1942
O4 6616   18/03/1944
O4 6608   03/08/1946