Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 522 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1694 Week
» 20595 Month
» 20595 Year
» 1685971 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3413
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6328   14/12/1940
O4 6632   07/08/1943
O4 6280   05/01/1946
O4 3688   03/02/1948
O4 63912   05/03/1949