Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 648 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 19716 Month
» 252636 Year
» 1918012 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #853
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6524   07/02/1928
O4 6558   12/03/1932
O4 6504   19/10/1935
O4 6599   19/06/1937
O4 6291   18/11/1939
O4 6556   12/07/1941
O4 6376   27/11/1943
O4 6616   22/06/1946
O4 63883   26/03/1949