Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 504 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5491 Week
» 13606 Month
» 141049 Year
» 1806425 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1228
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1976   10/1918
O4 6609   04/02/1933
O4 6600   20/03/1937
O4 6557   24/06/1939
O4 6508   27/09/1941