Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 992 Today
» 887 Yesterday
» 6794 Week
» 18031 Month
» 250951 Year
» 1916327 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1789
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15B
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O5 10   08/1919
O5 5415   19/12/1925
O5 5418   25/06/1931
B6 5053   04/07/1936
B6 5416   25/02/1939