Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 52 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2978 Week
» 4716 Month
» 132159 Year
» 1797535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1792
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15B
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O5 13   10/1919
O5 5010   02/11/1929
O5 5422   27/06/1931
O5 5415   04/08/1934
B6 5416   03/04/1937