Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 507 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5494 Week
» 13609 Month
» 141052 Year
» 1806428 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #64
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15B
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B6 53   04/1921
B6 5052   02/08/1930
O5 5420   05/10/1935
O5 5010   05/11/1938
B6 5052   23/08/1941
B6 5053   09/02/1946