Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 539 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1447 Week
» 12592 Month
» 112377 Year
» 1777753 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15B
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O5 14   11/1920
O5 15   23/06/1923
O5 5013   06/04/1929
O5 5421   31/10/1931
O5 5010   13/06/1936
B6 5053   28/01/1939