Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 25 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 866 Week
» 14802 Month
» 142245 Year
» 1807621 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #5
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15B
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O5 17   12/1920
O5 11   13/07/1923
O5 5010   28/02/1925
O5 5017   18/08/1928
O5 5022   10/12/1932