Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 32 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2958 Week
» 4696 Month
» 132139 Year
» 1797515 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28283
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 3806   06/01/1951
O1 63795   10/10/1953
O1 63663   24/12/1955
O1 63887   23/11/1957