Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 75 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 75 Week
» 11220 Month
» 111005 Year
» 1776381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1106
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2073   08/1919
O4 6337   09/08/1930
O4 6623   23/07/1932
O4 6357   02/02/1935
O4 6616   03/07/1937