Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 536 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1444 Week
» 12589 Month
» 112374 Year
» 1777750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3316
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6538   04/01/1941
O4 6526   30/10/1943
O4 6349   14/09/1946
O4 63841   19/02/1949