Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 456 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5443 Week
» 13558 Month
» 141001 Year
» 1806377 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3252
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6515   18/07/1936
O4 6337   17/09/1938
O4 6280   03/05/1941
O4 6611   05/12/1942
O4 6632   17/11/1945