Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 619 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1527 Week
» 12672 Month
» 112457 Year
» 1777833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #803
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6316   28/05/1927
O4 6591   19/12/1931
O4 6517   18/08/1934
O4 6641   19/09/1936
O4 6497   25/03/1939