Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 499 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5486 Week
» 13601 Month
» 141044 Year
» 1806420 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28375
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63901   05/04/1952
O1 63780   26/03/1954
O4 63837   08/09/1956
O4 63819   27/11/1959