Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 645 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1553 Week
» 12698 Month
» 112483 Year
» 1777859 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28837
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 63807   08/11/1952
B1 61314   03/11/1954
B1 61276   10/09/1956
B1 61322   20/02/1959