Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 50 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2976 Week
» 4714 Month
» 132157 Year
» 1797533 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28511
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61130   02/12/1950
B1 61374   15/10/1952
B1 61137   22/03/1954
O4 63858   19/01/1957
O4 63828   23/11/1962