Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18610 Week
» 71626 Month
» 191153 Year
» 3218006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #28202
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
100A |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B1 |
61021 |
REITBOK |
04/04/1951 |
B1 |
61078 |
|
13/06/1953 |
B1 |
61004 |
ORYX |
20/04/1955 |
B1 |
61111 |
|
14/02/1958 |
B1 |
61379 |
MAYFLOWER |
10/06/1960 |
O1 |
63863 |
|
14/12/1962 |
|