Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 947 Today
» 919 Yesterday
» 3776 Week
» 4715 Month
» 208205 Year
» 1873581 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28118
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61240 HARRY HINCHLIFFE 12/12/1950
B1 61296   06/07/1952
O4 63893   30/11/1954
O1 63874   25/08/1956
O1 63865   23/09/1961