Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 50 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2976 Week
» 4714 Month
» 132157 Year
» 1797533 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28527
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61252   03/02/1951
B1 61052   13/03/1953
B1 61287   20/11/1954
B1 61223   17/04/1957
B1 61329   07/05/1959
O1 63868   29/03/1963