Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 421 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5408 Week
» 13523 Month
» 140966 Year
» 1806342 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28369
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63869   05/01/1952
B1 61295   19/06/1954
B1 61010 WILDEBEESTE 31/07/1957
B1 61063   18/11/1959