Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 427 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5414 Week
» 13529 Month
» 140972 Year
» 1806348 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28500
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61104   09/09/1950
O2 63945   23/11/1956
B1 61153   05/01/1960
O1 63879   22/08/1962